MI SB0992 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0436'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0436'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Aeronautics; other; unmanned aerial systems act; enact. Creates new act.
Title
Aeronautics; other; unmanned aerial systems act; enact. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter MacGregor [R] | Sen. Mike Nofs [R] | Sen. Thomas Casperson [R] | Sen. Darwin Booher [R] |
Sen. John Brandenburg [R] | Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 752 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 648 (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 552 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 648 (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 552 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0436'16 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/4/2017 @ 12:00 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/3/2017 @ 7:10 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2016 @ 3:46 Pm |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 752 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-13 | Senate | House Substitute H-3 Concurred In |
2016-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-13 | House | Passed Roll Call # 648 Yeas 103 Nays 5 |
2016-12-13 | House | Amended |
2016-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-08 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2016-12-08 | House | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted |
2016-12-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2016-10-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology |
2016-10-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-10-19 | House | Received On 10/19/2016 |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 552 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Macgregor |
Subjects
Aeronautics: other
Crimes: other
Crimes: public office and officers
Crimes: sex offender registration
Crimes: stalking
Crimes: surveillance
Crimes: other
Crimes: public office and officers
Crimes: sex offender registration
Crimes: stalking
Crimes: surveillance