MI SB0991 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0327'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Gaming: other; multijurisdictional internet poker; allow. Amends secs. 3, 5, 7 & 11 of 2019 PA 152 (MCL 432.303 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming: other; multijurisdictional internet poker; allow. Amends secs. 3, 5, 7 & 11 of 2019 PA 152 (MCL 432.303 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 631 (Y: 85 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 389 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-30SenateAssigned Pa 0327'20
2020-12-30SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 03:06 Pm
2020-12-30SenateApproved By Governor 12/29/2020 11:18 Am
2020-12-23SenatePresented To Governor 12/22/2020 12:04 Pm
2020-12-18SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-12-18SenateFull Title Agreed To
2020-12-18SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2020-12-17HouseReturned To Senate
2020-12-17HouseInserted Full Title
2020-12-17HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 631 Yeas 85 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 9
2020-12-17HouseRead A Third Time
2020-12-17HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-12-17HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-12-17HouseRead A Second Time
2020-12-02HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-12-02HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2020-12-01HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2020-10-01HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2020-10-01HouseRead A First Time
2020-10-01HouseReceived On 10/01/2020
2020-10-01SenatePassed Roll Call # 389 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-09-30SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2020-09-30SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-09-30SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-09-24SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2020-09-24SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-09-24SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-06-25SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2020-06-25SenateIntroduced By Senator Curtis Hertel, Jr.
2020-12-18SenateImmediate Effect Defeated

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-SB-0991
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2020-SIB-0991.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBS-0991.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBH-0991.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2020-SNB-0991.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0327.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-24-073.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-10-01-076.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-12-02-093.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-12-17-100.htm

Bill Comments

feedback