MI SB0979 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0484'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Probate; trusts; personal property trust perpetuities act; modify to account for decanted trusts. Amends secs. 2 & 3 of 2008 PA 148 (MCL 554.92 & 554.93).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probate; trusts; personal property trust perpetuities act; modify to account for decanted trusts. Amends secs. 2 & 3 of 2008 PA 148 (MCL 554.92 & 554.93).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 768 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Banking And Financial Services (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 372 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0484'12 With Immediate Effect
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 1:12 Pm
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 12/26/2012 @ 11:22 Am 2012 Addenda
2012-12-27SenatePresented To Governor 12/21/2012 @ 10:38 Am
2012-12-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-13SenateFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-13SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2012-12-13SenateHouse Inserted Full Title
2012-12-12HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-12HouseInserted Full Title
2012-12-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 768 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2012-12-12HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-11HouseRead A Second Time
2012-12-05HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-12-05HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2012-09-13HouseRecommendation Concurred In
2012-09-13HouseReported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Banking And Financial Services
2012-05-23HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2012-05-23HouseRead A First Time
2012-05-23HouseReceived On 05/23/2012
2012-05-23SenatePassed Roll Call # 372 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2012-05-22SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2012-05-22SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2012-05-09SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2012-05-09SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-05-09SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2012-02-23SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-SB-0979
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2012-SIB-0979.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBS-0979.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBH-0979.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2012-SNB-0979.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0484.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-05-09-044.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-05-23-050.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-09-13-067.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-05-078.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-12-081.htm

Bill Comments

feedback