MI SB0977 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Elections: offenses; certain felonies involving absent voter ballot applications; create. Amends sec. 759 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: offenses; certain felonies involving absent voter ballot applications; create. Amends sec. 759 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 357 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 462 (Y: 77 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 239 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21SenatePostponed For The Day
2020-10-21SenateVetoed By Governor 10/16/2020
2020-10-06SenatePresented To Governor 10/05/2020 03:42 Pm
2020-09-30SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-09-30SenateFull Title Agreed To
2020-09-30SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2020-09-30SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 357 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2020-09-30SenateHouse Substitute (h-5) Concurred In
2020-09-29SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2020-09-24HouseReturned To Senate
2020-09-24HouseInserted Full Title
2020-09-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 462 Yeas 77 Nays 26 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
2020-09-24HouseRead A Third Time
2020-09-24HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-09-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-09-24HouseSubstitute (h-5) Adopted
2020-09-24HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2020-09-24HouseRead A Second Time
2020-09-22HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-09-22HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2020-09-09HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-2)
2020-07-21HouseReferred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
2020-07-21HouseRead A First Time
2020-07-21HouseReceived On 07/21/2020
2020-06-25SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2020-06-25SenatePassed Roll Call # 239 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-06-25SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-06-25SenateRules Suspended
2020-06-25SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-06-25SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-06-25SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-06-25SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-06-25SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2020-06-18SenateReferred To Committee On Elections
2020-06-18SenateIntroduced By Senator Kevin Daley

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-SB-0977
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2020-SIB-0977.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBS-0977.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBH-0977.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2020-SNB-0977.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-06-25-058.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-09-22-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-09-24-076.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-30-075.htm

Bill Comments

feedback