MI SB0963 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Assigned Pa 0122'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; other; presentation of general appropriations bills to the governor; revise. Amends sec. 365 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1365).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; other; presentation of general appropriations bills to the governor; revise. Amends sec. 365 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1365).

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22SenateAssigned Pa 0122'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-07-22SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 07/01/2020 01:38 Pm
2020-07-22SenateApproved By Governor 07/01/2020 10:50 Am
2020-07-22SenatePresented To Governor 06/25/2020 02:44 Pm
2020-06-24SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-16SenateFull Title Agreed To
2020-06-23HouseReturned To Senate
2020-06-23HouseInserted Full Title
2020-06-23HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 259 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2020-06-23HouseRead A Third Time
2020-06-23HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-06-23HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-06-23HouseRead A Second Time
2020-06-17HousePlaced On Second Reading
2020-06-17HouseRule Suspended
2020-06-17HouseRead A First Time
2020-06-17HouseRule Suspended
2020-06-16HouseReceived On 06/16/2020
2020-06-16SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 180 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2020-06-16SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-06-16SenateRules Suspended
2020-06-16SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-06-16SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-06-10SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-06-10SenateRules Suspended
2020-06-10SenateIntroduced By Senator Curtis Hertel, Jr.

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback