MI SB0942 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Assigned Pa 0126'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Liquor; licenses; certain regulations relating to the sale, delivery, and purchase of alcoholic liquor by an on-premises licensee; modify. Amends secs. 205, 233, 536, 609c, & 1014 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1205 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5811'20, HB 5781'19, HB 5343'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liquor; licenses; certain regulations relating to the sale, delivery, and purchase of alcoholic liquor by an on-premises licensee; modify. Amends secs. 205, 233, 536, 609c, & 1014 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1205 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5811'20, HB 5781'19, HB 5343'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 168 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22SenateAssigned Pa 0126'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-07-22SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 07/01/2020 01:46 Pm
2020-07-22SenateApproved By Governor 07/01/2020 10:58 Am
2020-07-22SenatePresented To Governor 06/30/2020 11:23 Am
2020-06-25SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-25SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2020-06-25SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2020-06-25SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 253 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-06-25SenateHouse Substitute (h-5) Concurred In
2020-06-24HouseReturned To Senate
2020-06-24HouseTitle Amended
2020-06-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 262 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2020-06-17HouseSubstitute (h-5) Adopted
2020-06-24HouseRead A Third Time
2020-06-17HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-06-17HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted
2020-06-17HouseRead A Second Time
2020-06-17HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-06-17HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3)
2020-06-11HousePer Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
2020-06-10HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2020-06-10HouseRead A First Time
2020-06-10HouseReceived On 06/10/2020
2020-06-10SenatePassed Roll Call # 168 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2020-06-09SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
2020-06-09SenateSubstitute (s-2) Concurred In
2020-06-09SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2020-06-09SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
2020-06-09SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-06-09SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2020-05-28SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2020-05-28SenateIntroduced By Senator Aric Nesbitt

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-SB-0942
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2020-SIB-0942.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBS-0942.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBH-0942.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2020-SNB-0942.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0126.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-06-09-050.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-06-10-051.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-06-17-055.htm

Bill Comments

feedback