MI SB0942 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-13 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-13 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victims; other; crime victims fund; allocate into child assessment centers. Amends sec. 4 of 1989 PA 196 (MCL 780.904).
Title
Crime victims; other; crime victims fund; allocate into child assessment centers. Amends sec. 4 of 1989 PA 196 (MCL 780.904).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 466 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2016-07-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-06-09 | House | Received On 06/09/2016 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 466 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rebekah Warren |