MI SB0942 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0557'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0557'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; other; safe drinking water act; make subject to environmental leaders program. Amends sec. 23 of 1976 PA 399 (MCL 325.1023). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0939'12
Title
Environmental protection; other; safe drinking water act; make subject to environmental leaders program. Amends sec. 23 of 1976 PA 399 (MCL 325.1023). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0939'12
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Casperson [R] | Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] | Sen. Michael Green [R] | Sen. Mark Jansen [R] |
Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. Arlan Meekhof [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 714 (Y: 64 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 335 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 335 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0557'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 5:08 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 3:29 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2012 @ 10:06 Am |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-11 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-06 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-06 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 714 Yeas 64 Nays 44 |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-05-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2012-05-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-05-15 | House | Received On 05/15/2012 |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 335 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |