MI SB0941 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0227'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0227'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; school aid; Marshall plan for talent; enact.
Title
Appropriations; school aid; Marshall plan for talent; enact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 546 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 488 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 387 (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 488 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 387 (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0227'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/27/2018 @ 9:10 Am |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/26/2018 @ 2:40 Pm |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/25/2018 @ 1:40 Pm |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call # 546 Yeas 34 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2018-06-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-06-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 488 Yeas 105 Nays 4 |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-06-12 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-06-12 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-06-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-05-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-05-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-30 | House | Received On 05/30/2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 387 Yeas 30 Nays 2 Excused 5 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Hildenbrand |