MI SB0937 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Vetoed By Governor 07/08/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Vetoed By Governor 07/08/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; withholding requirements; remittance of withholding tax payments during state of emergency; delay for certain taxpayers. Amends secs. 703 & 705 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.703 & 206.705).
Title
Individual income tax; withholding requirements; remittance of withholding tax payments during state of emergency; delay for certain taxpayers. Amends secs. 703 & 705 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.703 & 206.705).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 282 (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 219 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 219 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 07/08/2020 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Presented To Governor 06/30/2020 11:21 Am |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-06-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-06-24 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-06-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 282 Yeas 98 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-06-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-06-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-06-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-06-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-06-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2020-06-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-06-18 | House | Received On 06/18/2020 |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 219 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Curtis S. Vanderwall |
Subjects
Corporate income tax: withholding requirements
Individual income tax: withholding requirements
State agencies (existing): treasury
Individual income tax: withholding requirements
State agencies (existing): treasury