MI SB0937 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0166'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0166'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; other; receivers; limit powers related to secured instruments. Amends sec. 8115a of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.8115a).
Title
Insurance; other; receivers; limit powers related to secured instruments. Amends sec. 8115a of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.8115a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 435 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 148 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 148 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0166'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/14/2012 @ 11:16 Am |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/14/2012 @ 9:04 Am |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/12/2012 @ 12:05 Pm |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Roll Call # 435 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-05 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-30 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-05-30 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-05-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-29 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-05-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-03-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Services |
2012-03-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-03-21 | House | Received On 03/21/2012 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 148 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |