MI SB0934 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 18 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-30 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 18 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-30 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor: retail sales; allowing in state and out-of-state small wine makers to deliver wine to retailers; provide for. Amends1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 203b. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1140'20, SB 1138'20, SB 1139'20
Title
Liquor: retail sales; allowing in state and out-of-state small wine makers to deliver wine to retailers; provide for. Amends1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 203b. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1140'20, SB 1138'20, SB 1139'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 563 (Y: 102 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 431 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 431 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Pocket Veto 01/05/2021 |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2020 04:27 Pm |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-12-16 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-16 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 563 Yeas 102 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2020-12-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-12-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-12-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-12-04 | House | Received On 12/04/2020 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 431 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt |
Subjects
Liquor: distribution
Liquor: manufacturer
Liquor: retail sales
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Liquor: manufacturer
Liquor: retail sales
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs