MI SB0925 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-09 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-09 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children; adoption; advertise for, solicit, or recruit prospective adoptive or biological parents or guardians to participate in certain transfers of a child; prohibit under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 55, ch. X of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 710.55). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0924'16
Title
Children; adoption; advertise for, solicit, or recruit prospective adoptive or biological parents or guardians to participate in certain transfers of a child; prohibit under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 55, ch. X of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 710.55). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0924'16
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 608 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-11-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-11-09 | House | Received On 10/20/2016 |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 608 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |
Same As/Similar To
HB5626 (Same As) 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 481'16