MI SB0910 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0417'14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0417'14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; air pollution; wood heaters; prohibit department of environmental quality from promulgating certain rules or enforcing federal regulations. Amends sec. 5512 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.5512) & adds sec. 5514.
Title
Environmental protection; air pollution; wood heaters; prohibit department of environmental quality from promulgating certain rules or enforcing federal regulations. Amends sec. 5512 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.5512) & adds sec. 5514.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Casperson [R] | Sen. Bruce Caswell [R] | Sen. David Robertson [R] | Sen. Mike Nofs [R] |
Sen. James Marleau [R] | Sen. Darwin Booher [R] | Sen. Michael Green [R] | Sen. Arlan Meekhof [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 678 (Y: 68 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 445 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 445 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0417'14 |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2014 @ 11:55 Am |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2014 @ 8:10 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/26/2014 @ 10:28 Am |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2014-12-16 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-16 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-16 | House | Passed Roll Call # 678 Yeas 68 Nays 41 |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2014-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2014 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 445 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |