MI SB0909 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0387'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0387'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; other; regional transit authority; establish. Creates new act & repeals secs. 4a & 4b of 1967 PA 204 (MCL 124.404a & 124.404b).
Title
Transportation; other; regional transit authority; establish. Creates new act & repeals secs. 4a & 4b of 1967 PA 204 (MCL 124.404a & 124.404b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 691 (Y: 57 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 756 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 753 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 756 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 753 (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0387'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/19/2012 @ 5:30 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/19/2012 @ 3:22 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/19/2012 @ 11:56 Am |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-06 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 691 Yeas 57 Nays 50 |
2012-12-06 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2012-12-05 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2012-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-05 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2012-11-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Received On 11/27/2012 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 756 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 753 Yeas 22 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Postponed Temporarily |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) Offered |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) Withdrawn |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Postponed Temporarily |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) Offered |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-7 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Substitute S-7 Concurred In |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-7 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB5309 (Same As) 2012-01-31 - Printed Bill Filed 01/27/2012