MI SB0901 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-27 - Assigned Pa 0355'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-27 - Assigned Pa 0355'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations; podiatrists; definitions and terms associated with the practice of podiatric medicine and surgery; modify. Amends sec. 18001 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.18001).
Title
Health occupations; podiatrists; definitions and terms associated with the practice of podiatric medicine and surgery; modify. Amends sec. 18001 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.18001).
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 588 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-10-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 625 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 521 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 625 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 521 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0355'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/15/2018 @ 1:50 Pm |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/15/2018 @ 10:27 Am |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/13/2018 @ 3:54 Pm |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Roll Call # 588 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-08 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2018-10-04 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-10-04 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-10-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 625 Yeas 106 Nays 0 |
2018-10-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-10-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-10-03 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-10-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-10-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-10-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 521 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Stamas |