MI SB0887 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Assigned Pa 0148'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Assigned Pa 0148'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; licensing fees; grain dealers; modify fees, and eliminate surety requirements. Amends sec. 8 of 1939 PA 141 (MCL 285.68) & repeals sec. 27 of 1939 PA 141 (MCL 285.87).
Title
Occupations; licensing fees; grain dealers; modify fees, and eliminate surety requirements. Amends sec. 8 of 1939 PA 141 (MCL 285.68) & repeals sec. 27 of 1939 PA 141 (MCL 285.87).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 260 (Y: 70 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 138 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 138 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0148'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/30/2012 @ 1:12 Pm |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/30/2012 @ 11:22 Am |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Presented To Governor 5/21/2012 @ 3:22 Pm |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-05-15 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-10 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-05-10 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 260 Yeas 70 Nays 37 |
2012-05-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-03-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-03-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-03-15 | House | Received On 03/15/2012 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 138 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-01-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |