MI SB0877 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred To Committee On Law And Justice
Pending: House Law And Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred To Committee On Law And Justice
Pending: House Law And Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Torts; governmental immunity; sexual misconduct by a governmental employee; exclude from governmental immunity. Amends 1964 PA 170 (MCL 691.1401 - 691.1419) by adding sec. 7d.
Title
Torts; governmental immunity; sexual misconduct by a governmental employee; exclude from governmental immunity. Amends 1964 PA 170 (MCL 691.1401 - 691.1419) by adding sec. 7d.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 154 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-03-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-03-15 | House | Received On 03/15/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 154 Yeas 28 Nays 7 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Marty Knollenberg |
Subjects
Crimes: abuse
Crimes: assaultive
Crimes: crimes against minors
Crimes: criminal sexual conduct
Education: other
Higher education: other
Local government: liability
Public employees and officers: other
State: other
Torts: governmental immunity
Crimes: assaultive
Crimes: crimes against minors
Crimes: criminal sexual conduct
Education: other
Higher education: other
Local government: liability
Public employees and officers: other
State: other
Torts: governmental immunity