MI SB0874 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Assigned Pa 0082'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Assigned Pa 0082'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; licenses; revocation of license for multiple sales to minors; base on consecutive 12-month period. Amends sec. 501 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1501).
Title
Liquor; licenses; revocation of license for multiple sales to minors; base on consecutive 12-month period. Amends sec. 501 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1501).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 146 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 142 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 85 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 142 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 85 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0082'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/11/2012 @ 3:48 Pm |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Approved By Governor 4/10/2012 @ 8:24 Am |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Presented To Governor 4/2/2012 @ 1:15 Pm |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-03-29 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-03-29 | House | Re-returned To Senate |
2012-03-29 | House | Roll Call # 146 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2012-03-29 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-03-29 | House | Returned As Requested |
2012-03-28 | House | House Requests Return |
2012-03-27 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-03-27 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-03-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 142 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-03-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-03-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-03-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-02-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2012-02-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-02-16 | House | Received On 02/16/2012 |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 85 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |