MI SB0873 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred To Committee On Law And Justice
Pending: House Law And Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred To Committee On Law And Justice
Pending: House Law And Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children; protection; mandatory reporting requirements for child abuse or child neglect; expand to include K-12 coaches and volunteers. Amends sec. 3 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.623).
Title
Children; protection; mandatory reporting requirements for child abuse or child neglect; expand to include K-12 coaches and volunteers. Amends sec. 3 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.623).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 150 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-03-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-03-15 | House | Received On 03/15/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 150 Yeas 34 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Margaret O'brien |
Subjects
Children: child abuse or child neglect
Children: protection
Education: athletics
Higher education: community colleges
Higher education: private schools
Higher education: state universities
Children: protection
Education: athletics
Higher education: community colleges
Higher education: private schools
Higher education: state universities