MI SB0873 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0480'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Transportation; carriers; indemnity clauses; prohibit in motor carrier transportation contracts. Amends 1933 PA 254 (MCL 475.1 - 479.43) by adding sec. 21 to art. V.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation; carriers; indemnity clauses; prohibit in motor carrier transportation contracts. Amends 1933 PA 254 (MCL 475.1 - 479.43) by adding sec. 21 to art. V.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 707 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 400 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0480'12
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 1:04 Pm
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 12/27/2012 @ 9:21 Am 2012 Addenda
2012-12-27SenatePresented To Governor 12/21/2012 @ 9:58 Am
2012-12-11SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-11SenateFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-11SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2012-12-11SenateHouse Inserted Full Title
2012-12-06HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-06HouseInserted Full Title
2012-12-06HousePassed Roll Call # 707 Yeas 57 Nays 52
2012-12-06HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-04HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-04HouseRead A Second Time
2012-09-19HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-09-19HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2012-05-30HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation
2012-05-30HouseRead A First Time
2012-05-30HouseReceived On 05/30/2012
2012-05-30SenatePassed Roll Call # 400 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2012-05-29SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2012-05-29SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2012-05-09SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2012-05-09SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-05-09SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2011-12-07SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-SB-0873
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2011-SIB-0873.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBS-0873.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBH-0873.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2011-SNB-0873.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0480.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-05-09-044.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-05-30-053.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-09-19-068.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-06-079.htm

Bill Comments

feedback