MI SB0841 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Assigned Pa 0131'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Assigned Pa 0131'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses; partnerships; liability for obligations of limited liability partnerships; clarify. Amends sec. 46 of 1917 PA 72 (MCL 449.46).
Title
Businesses; partnerships; liability for obligations of limited liability partnerships; clarify. Amends sec. 46 of 1917 PA 72 (MCL 449.46).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 228 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 132 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 132 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0131'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/3/2018 @ 11:38 Am |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/2/2018 @ 8:52 Pm |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Presented To Governor 4/25/2018 @ 12:12 Pm |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-04-17 | House | Transmitted |
2018-04-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 228 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2018-04-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-04-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-04-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2018-03-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-03-07 | House | Received On 03/07/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 132 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jack Brandenburg |