MI SB0821 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; registration plates; Blue Star Family registration plates; create. Amends sec. 803e of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.803e).
Title
Vehicles; registration plates; Blue Star Family registration plates; create. Amends sec. 803e of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.803e).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 563 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 563 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-09-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-09-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-09-27 | House | Received On 09/27/2018 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 563 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Phillip Pavlov |