MI SB0810 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0523'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0523'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; other; village elections to be held in November; require, and general amendments to the Michigan election law. Amends secs. 4, 381, 523, 642, 642a, 699, 759, 759a, 761, 813 & 829 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.4 et seq.); adds secs, 38 & 497c & repeals sec. 500f of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.500f).
Title
Elections; other; village elections to be held in November; require, and general amendments to the Michigan election law. Amends secs. 4, 381, 523, 642, 642a, 699, 759, 759a, 761, 813 & 829 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.4 et seq.); adds secs, 38 & 497c & repeals sec. 500f of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.500f).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1087 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 884 (Y: 71 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 795 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 884 (Y: 71 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 795 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0523'12 |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 4:58 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2012 @ 9:29 Am |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 3:16 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Roll Call # 1087 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Substitute H-3 Concurred In |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Amended Title |
2012-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-14 | House | Title Amended |
2012-12-14 | House | Passed Roll Call # 884 Yeas 71 Nays 36 |
2012-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-14 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted And Amended |
2012-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Redistricting And Elections |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2012 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Title Amended |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 795 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Adopted |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |
Subjects
Elections, absent voters
Elections, ballots
Elections, election officials
Elections, local
Elections, other
Elections, registration
Elections, voters
Health facilities, homes for the aged
Health facilities, nursing homes
State agencies (existing), state
Elections, ballots
Elections, election officials
Elections, local
Elections, other
Elections, registration
Elections, voters
Health facilities, homes for the aged
Health facilities, nursing homes
State agencies (existing), state