MI SB0798 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Assigned Pa 0434'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Assigned Pa 0434'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; other; safe families program to allow a parent or guardian to delegate temporary care of minor child via power of attorney; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0489'17, SB 0490'17, SB 0797'18
Title
Children; other; safe families program to allow a parent or guardian to delegate temporary care of minor child via power of attorney; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0489'17, SB 0490'17, SB 0797'18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 838 (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 110 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 110 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0434'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2018 @ 1:46 Pm |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/20/2018 @ 11:07 Am |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/17/2018 @ 5:14 Pm |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 838 Yeas 65 Nays 44 |
2018-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2018-02-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-02-22 | House | Received On 02/22/2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 110 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Macgregor |