MI SB0797 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Children; other; licensing of organization providing service under the safe families program; clarify. Amends 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111 - 722.128) by adding sec. 8c. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0489'17, SB 0490'17, SB 0798'18

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; other; licensing of organization providing service under the safe families program; clarify. Amends 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111 - 722.128) by adding sec. 8c. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0489'17, SB 0490'17, SB 0798'18

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 837 (Y: 64 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 109 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-12-13HouseReturned To Senate
2018-12-13HouseInserted Full Title
2018-12-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 837 Yeas 64 Nays 45
2018-12-13HouseRead A Third Time
2018-12-13HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-12-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-12-12HouseRead A Second Time
2018-11-29HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-11-29HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-02-22HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2018-02-22HouseRead A First Time
2018-02-22HouseReceived On 02/22/2018
2018-02-22SenatePassed Roll Call # 109 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-02-21SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-02-21SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-02-21SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-02-20SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-02-20SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-02-20SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-01-30SenateReferred To Committee On Oversight
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced By Senator Vincent Gregory

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback