MI SB0795 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-07 - Assigned Pa 0155'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-07 - Assigned Pa 0155'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; drunk driving; repeat drunk driving offenders; establish license sanctions for DWI/sobriety court participants. Amends secs. 219, 303, 319, 625n, 626, 732a & 904d of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.219 et seq.) & adds sec. 304. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5273'09
Title
Crimes; drunk driving; repeat drunk driving offenders; establish license sanctions for DWI/sobriety court participants. Amends secs. 219, 303, 319, 625n, 626, 732a & 904d of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.219 et seq.) & adds sec. 304. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5273'09
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-07 | Assigned Pa 0155'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-09-07 | Filed With Secretary Of State 9/2/2010 @ 11:20 Am | |
2010-09-07 | Approved By Governor 9/2/2010 @ 10:07 Am | |
2010-08-24 | Presented To Governor 8/19/2010 @ 3:15 Pm | |
2010-07-28 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-07-28 | Title Amendment Agreed To | |
2010-07-28 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-07-28 | Roll Call # 372 Yeas 29 Nays 2 Excused 7 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-07-28 | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In | |
2010-07-28 | House Amended Title | |
2010-05-27 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Title Amended | |
2010-05-27 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 228 Yeas 105 Nays 1 | |
2010-05-27 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-05-27 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-05-27 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-05-27 | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended | |
2010-05-27 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-05-19 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-05-19 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2010-02-09 | Read A First Time | |
2010-02-09 | Received On 02/09/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Passed Roll Call # 44 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-02-09 | Amendment(s) Defeated | |
2010-02-04 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-02-04 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-02-04 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-02-02 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-02-02 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-02-02 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-09-09 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB5274 (Same As) 2010-08-24 - Re-referred To Committee On Judiciary