MI SB0791 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Assigned Pa 0123'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Assigned Pa 0123'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property; other; uniform real property electronic recording act; create. Creates new act.
Title
Property; other; uniform real property electronic recording act; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Assigned Pa 0123'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-07-21 | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/19/2010 @ 9:20 Am | |
2010-07-21 | Approved By Governor 7/19/2010 @ 8:47 Am | |
2010-07-21 | Presented To Governor 7/8/2010 @ 11:24 Am | |
2010-07-01 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-07-01 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-07-01 | Roll Call # 354 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-07-01 | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In | |
2010-07-01 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-07-01 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 318 Yeas 106 Nays 0 | |
2010-07-01 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2010-07-01 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-05-18 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-11-10 | Referred To Committee On Intergovernmental And Regional Affairs | |
2009-11-10 | Read A First Time | |
2009-11-10 | Received On 11/10/2009 | |
2009-11-10 | Passed Roll Call # 588 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-11-05 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-11-05 | Substitute S-2 Concurred In | |
2009-11-05 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-10-29 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-10-29 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-10-29 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-09-09 | Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs |