MI SB0759 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Assigned Pa 0160'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Assigned Pa 0160'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; hunting; prohibition on person holding a fur dealer's license from holding a license to trap beaver; remove. Amends sec. 42501 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.42501).
Title
Natural resources; hunting; prohibition on person holding a fur dealer's license from holding a license to trap beaver; remove. Amends sec. 42501 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.42501).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 279 (Y: 102 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 104 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 104 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0160'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/11/2014 @ 4:12 Pm |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/11/2014 @ 12:06 Pm |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/4/2014 @ 11:39 Am |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-05-27 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2014-05-22 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-05-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 279 Yeas 102 Nays 8 |
2014-05-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2014-03-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-03-13 | House | Received On 03/13/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 104 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |