MI SB0744 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0164'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0164'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; permits; permit processing period; extend at request of applicant under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 1307 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.1307).
Title
Environmental protection; permits; permit processing period; extend at request of applicant under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 1307 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.1307).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 341 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 81 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 81 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0164'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/14/2012 @ 11:12 Am |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/14/2012 @ 9:18 Am |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/12/2012 @ 11:57 Am |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-06-05 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-31 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-05-31 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-05-31 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 341 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-05-31 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-04-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-04-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2012-02-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-02-15 | House | Received On 02/15/2012 |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 81 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-10-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |