MI SB0726 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0363'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0363'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; statute of limitations; statute of limitations for certain crimes; revise. Amends sec. 24, ch. VII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 767.24).
Title
Criminal procedure; statute of limitations; statute of limitations for certain crimes; revise. Amends sec. 24, ch. VII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 767.24).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. Mike Nofs [R] | Sen. Tonya Schuitmaker [R] | Sen. Mark Jansen [R] |
Sen. James Marleau [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] | Sen. John Brandenburg [R] | Sen. John Pappageorge [R] |
Sen. Tory Rocca [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 808 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 638 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 37 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 638 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 37 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0363'12 |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2012 @ 4:18 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/14/2012 @ 9:20 Am |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/13/2012 @ 9:26 Am |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Roll Call # 808 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-04 | Senate | House Amended Title |
2012-11-29 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-11-29 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-11-29 | House | Passed Roll Call # 638 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-28 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2012-11-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2012-02-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-02-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-02-07 | House | Received On 02/07/2012 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 37 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-10-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes, attempts
Crimes, home invasion
Crimes, homicide
Crimes, kidnapping
Criminal procedure, statute of limitations
Crimes, home invasion
Crimes, homicide
Crimes, kidnapping
Criminal procedure, statute of limitations