MI SB0721 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - Assigned Pa 0172'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - Assigned Pa 0172'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management: funds; references in the health and safety fund act to the tobacco products tax act; update. Amends sec. 3 of 1987 PA 264 (MCL 141.473). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0720'21
Title
State financing and management: funds; references in the health and safety fund act to the tobacco products tax act; update. Amends sec. 3 of 1987 PA 264 (MCL 141.473). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0720'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 77 (Y: 81 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 11 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 11 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0172'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/21/2022 11:20 Am |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/21/2022 09:56 Am |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/11/2022 01:56 Pm |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Immediate Effect Postponed |
2022-02-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 77 Yeas 81 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-02-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2022-01-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-01-27 | House | Received On 01/27/2022 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 11 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Runestad |