MI SB0721 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; sand dunes; criteria for issuance of a variance to a public entity involving certain public land; provide for. Amends sec. 35317 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.35317).
Title
Natural resources; sand dunes; criteria for issuance of a variance to a public entity involving certain public land; provide for. Amends sec. 35317 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.35317).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1047 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1001 (Y: 62 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 240 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1001 (Y: 62 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 240 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2018 @ 1:12 Pm |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Roll Call # 1047 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-21 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1001 Yeas 62 Nays 45 |
2018-12-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-12-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-21 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2018-12-21 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-05-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-01 | House | Received On 05/01/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 240 Yeas 26 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |
Subjects
Natural resources: sand dunes
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
State agencies (existing): natural resources
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
State agencies (existing): natural resources