MI SB0721 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0186'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0186'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; business licensing and regulation; purchases of plastic bulk merchandise containers; regulate dealers and transactions. Creates new act.
Title
Occupations; business licensing and regulation; purchases of plastic bulk merchandise containers; regulate dealers and transactions. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. James Marleau [R] | Sen. Steven Bieda [D] | Sen. Judith Emmons [R] |
Sen. Tonya Schuitmaker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 333 (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 22 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 22 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0186'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/20/2012 @ 3:41 Pm |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/14/2012 @ 9:06 Am |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/12/2012 @ 11:53 Am |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-05-31 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-05-31 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 333 Yeas 99 Nays 10 |
2012-05-31 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-01-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2012-01-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-01-26 | House | Received On 01/26/2012 |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 22 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-10-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
Subjects
Crimes, stolen property
Occupations, business licensing and regulation
Occupations, individual licensing and regulation
Occupations, business licensing and regulation
Occupations, individual licensing and regulation