MI SB0704 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 465'18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 465'18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Taxation; convention tourism assessments; regional convention and tourism promotion act; revise. Amends title & sec. 2 of 2010 PA 254 (MCL 141.1432) & adds secs. 1a, 6a & 6b.
Title
Taxation; convention tourism assessments; regional convention and tourism promotion act; revise. Amends title & sec. 2 of 2010 PA 254 (MCL 141.1432) & adds secs. 1a, 6a & 6b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 930 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 573 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 569 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 573 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 569 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 465'18 |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2018 @ 4:00 Pm |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/26/2018 @ 8:03 Pm |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/26/2018 @ 3:30 Pm |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | House | Passed Roll Call # 930 Yeas 96 Nays 12 |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-09-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Tourism And Outdoor Recreation |
2018-09-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-09-27 | House | Received On 09/27/2018 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 573 Yeas 27 Nays 9 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 569 Yeas 28 Nays 8 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |