MI SB0670 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-19 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-19 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans; other; World War I centennial commission; create. Creates new act.
Title
Veterans; other; World War I centennial commission; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 546 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2016-10-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-10-19 | House | Received On 10/19/2016 |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 546 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rebekah Warren |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
State agencies (proposed): boards and commissions
Veterans: other
State agencies (proposed): boards and commissions
Veterans: other