MI SB0661 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming: horse racing; pari-mutuel wagering on horse races run in the past; allow, and modify certain licensing procedures. Amends secs. 2, 6a, 8, 9 & 22 of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.302 et seq.); adds secs. 19d & 20a & repeals sec. 19b of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.319b).
Title
Gaming: horse racing; pari-mutuel wagering on horse races run in the past; allow, and modify certain licensing procedures. Amends secs. 2, 6a, 8, 9 & 22 of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.302 et seq.); adds secs. 19d & 20a & repeals sec. 19b of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.319b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 376 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 376 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-5) |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-12-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-12-11 | House | Received On 12/11/2019 |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 376 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Ananich |