MI SB0658 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0553'14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0553'14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax; collections; collection of sales tax by retailers; create a statutory nexus standard. Amends 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.51 - 205.78) by adding sec. 3a.
Title
Sales tax; collections; collection of sales tax by retailers; create a statutory nexus standard. Amends 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.51 - 205.78) by adding sec. 3a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 918 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 787 (Y: 83 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 770 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 787 (Y: 83 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 770 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0553'14 |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/15/2015 @ 2:36 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/15/2015 @ 2:07 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/6/2015 @ 9:17 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2014-12-19 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 918 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-19 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-19 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-19 | House | Passed Roll Call # 787 Yeas 83 Nays 27 |
2014-12-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-19 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-19 | House | Amended |
2014-12-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-19 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2014-12-19 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2014-12-18 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2014-12-17 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2014-12-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-12-11 | House | Received On 12/11/2014 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 770 Yeas 21 Nays 16 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Ananich |