MI SB0637 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-17 - Assigned Pa 0320'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-17 - Assigned Pa 0320'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; school districts; certain display of United States flag in public school; require. Amends sec. 1347 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1347). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4934'11
Title
Education; school districts; certain display of United States flag in public school; require. Amends sec. 1347 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1347). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4934'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 638 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-12 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 518 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 689 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-11-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-12 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 518 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 689 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-11-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-17 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0320'12 |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/5/2012 @ 3:40 Pm |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/5/2012 @ 2:06 Pm |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 9/24/2012 @ 10:28 Am |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Roll Call # 638 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-20 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-09-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-09-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-09-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-09-12 | House | Passed Roll Call # 518 Yeas 102 Nays 6 |
2012-09-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-09-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-09-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-09-12 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2012-09-12 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2012-09-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-06-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-06-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-11-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2011-11-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-11-10 | House | Received On 11/10/2011 |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 689 Yeas 31 Nays 5 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-09-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |