MI SB0624 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0558'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0558'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses; charitable organizations; act relating to dissolution of domestic charitable purpose corporations; provide for general revisions. Amends title & secs. 1 & 2 of 1965 PA 169 (MCL 450.251 & 450.252) & adds secs. 1a & 2a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0623'13
Title
Businesses; charitable organizations; act relating to dissolution of domestic charitable purpose corporations; provide for general revisions. Amends title & secs. 1 & 2 of 1965 PA 169 (MCL 450.251 & 450.252) & adds secs. 1a & 2a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0623'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 715 (Y: 78 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 315 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 315 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0558'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/15/2015 @ 2:46 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/10/2015 @ 3:04 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 9:44 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 715 Yeas 78 Nays 31 |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-11-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-11-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-05-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2014-05-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-05-27 | House | Received On 05/27/2014 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 315 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |
Subjects
Businesses, charitable organizations
Businesses, nonprofit corporations
State agencies (existing), attorney general
Businesses, nonprofit corporations
State agencies (existing), attorney general