MI SB0621 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
Pending: House Commerce And Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
Pending: House Commerce And Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; other; qualifying period for assessment; modify. Amends secs. 10, 10a, 10c, 10f, 10g & 10k of 1961 PA 120 (MCL 125.990 et seq.).
Title
Economic development; other; qualifying period for assessment; modify. Amends secs. 10, 10a, 10c, 10f, 10g & 10k of 1961 PA 120 (MCL 125.990 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 554 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-12-13 | House | Received On 12/13/2017 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 554 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |