MI SB0614 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; abortion; health professional or facility seeking reimbursement from qualified health plan for elective abortion; prohibit unless coverage is by optional rider. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding secs. 16240 & 20195. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0612'11, SB 0613'11
Title
Health; abortion; health professional or facility seeking reimbursement from qualified health plan for elective abortion; prohibit unless coverage is by optional rider. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding secs. 16240 & 20195. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0612'11, SB 0613'11
Sponsors
Sen. John Brandenburg [R] | Sen. Bruce Caswell [R] | Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] | Sen. Judith Emmons [R] |
Sen. Dave Hildenbrand [R] | Sen. Mark Jansen [R] | Sen. David Robertson [R] | Sen. Tonya Schuitmaker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 832 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Received On 12/06/2012 |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 832 Yeas 28 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2011-09-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
Same As/Similar To
HB4776 (Same As) 2011-06-21 - Printed Bill Filed 06/17/2011