MI SB0613 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Pa 0047'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Pa 0047'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; other; reference in enhanced driver license and enhanced official state personal identification card act to driver responsibility fees; modify. Amends sec. 4 of 2008 PA 23 (MCL 28.304).
Title
Traffic control; other; reference in enhanced driver license and enhanced official state personal identification card act to driver responsibility fees; modify. Amends sec. 4 of 2008 PA 23 (MCL 28.304).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 68 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 423 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 423 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0047'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/1/2018 @ 4:14 Pm |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/1/2018 @ 1:32 Pm |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Presented To Governor 2/20/2018 @ 3:21 Pm |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-02-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-02-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 68 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-10-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-10-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-19 | House | Received On 10/19/2017 |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 423 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |