MI SB0612 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; health; abortion coverage in policies offered through the state exchange; prohibit except through the purchase of optional rider. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3407c.
Title
Insurance; health; abortion coverage in policies offered through the state exchange; prohibit except through the purchase of optional rider. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3407c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 830 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Received On 12/06/2012 |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 830 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2011-09-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
Same As/Similar To
HB4143 (Same As) 2011-01-27 - Printed Bill Filed 01/27/2011