MI SB0601 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0618'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0618'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2017-2018. Creates appropiation act.
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2017-2018. Creates appropiation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1044 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1003 (Y: 84 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 239 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1003 (Y: 84 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 239 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0618'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 5:48 Pm |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor With Line Item(s) Vetoed 12/28/2018 @ 2:57 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2018 @ 1:08 Pm |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Roll Call # 1044 Yeas 34 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1003 Yeas 84 Nays 23 |
2018-12-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2018-12-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-21 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2018-12-21 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-04-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-04-26 | House | Received On 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 239 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Hildenbrand |