MI SB0592 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Assigned Pa 0071'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Assigned Pa 0071'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities; other; designated places to perform surgical removal of a human organ; expand. Amends sec. 10205 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.10205).
Title
Health facilities; other; designated places to perform surgical removal of a human organ; expand. Amends sec. 10205 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.10205).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 141 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 91 (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 571 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 91 (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 571 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0071'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/5/2016 @ 1:42 Pm |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Approved By Governor 4/5/2016 @ 11:48 Am |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/28/2016 @ 2:43 Pm |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Roll Call # 141 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2016-03-03 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-03-03 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 91 Yeas 100 Nays 3 |
2016-03-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-03-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-02-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-12-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2015-12-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-12-09 | House | Received On 12/09/2015 |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 571 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Curtis Hertel |