MI SB0587 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-20 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-20 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; licenses; vendor of spirits providing a special licensee with certain brand logoed items; allow. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 609e.
Title
Liquor; licenses; vendor of spirits providing a special licensee with certain brand logoed items; allow. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 609e.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Moss [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 315 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-11-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-11-20 | House | Received On 11/13/2019 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 315 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jeremy Moss |