MI SB0574 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Assigned Pa 0023'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Assigned Pa 0023'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; financing; levy of regional enhancement millage; revise. Amends sec. 705 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.705).
Title
Education; financing; levy of regional enhancement millage; revise. Amends sec. 705 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.705).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 18 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 55 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 403 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 55 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 403 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0023'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/14/2018 @ 1:52 Pm |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Approved By Governor 2/12/2018 @ 11:02 Am |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 2/1/2018 @ 1:19 Pm |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Roll Call # 18 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2018-01-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-01-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-01-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 Yeas 55 Nays 52 |
2018-01-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-01-18 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2018-01-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-11-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-10-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Education Reform |
2017-10-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-18 | House | Received On 10/18/2017 |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 403 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Postponed Temporarily |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) Offered |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 As Amended |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Substitute S-3 As Amended Concurred In |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 And Amendment(s) |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Education |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Hildenbrand |
Subjects
Education: financing
Education: intermediate school districts
Education: public school academies
Property tax: millage
Education: intermediate school districts
Education: public school academies
Property tax: millage