MI SB0565 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Assigned Pa 0053'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations: supplemental; drinking water and water infrastructure improvements supplemental; provide for. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations: supplemental; drinking water and water infrastructure improvements supplemental; provide for. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 109 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 147 (Y: 95 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 461 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-12SenateAssigned Pa 0053'22 With Immediate Effect
2022-04-12SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 03/30/2022 01:50 Pm
2022-04-12SenateApproved By Governor 03/30/2022 11:09 Am
2022-04-12SenatePresented To Governor 03/29/2022 10:59 Am
2022-03-24SenateOrdered Enrolled
2022-03-24SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2022-03-24SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 109 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2022-03-24SenateHouse Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
2022-03-24HouseReturned To Senate
2022-03-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 147 Yeas 95 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2022-03-24HouseRead A Third Time
2022-03-24HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2022-03-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2022-03-24HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2022-03-24HouseRead A Second Time
2022-03-24HouseReferred To Second Reading
2022-03-24HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-12-02HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-12-02HouseRead A First Time
2021-12-02HouseReceived On 12/02/2021
2021-12-02SenatePassed Roll Call # 461 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 4 Not Voting 0
2021-12-02SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-12-02SenateRules Suspended
2021-12-02SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) As Amended
2021-12-02SenateSubstitute (s-2) As Amended Concurred In
2021-12-02SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) And Amendment(s)
2021-12-02SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
2021-12-02SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-12-02SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2021-06-24SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-06-24SenateIntroduced By Senator Jon C. Bumstead

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0565
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0565.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBS-0565.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBH-0565.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2021-SNB-0565.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2022-PA-0053.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0565-00B74.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0565-0N2918.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0565-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0565-S.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0565-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0565-00803C50.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0565-85D1CFB4.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0565-D153DFA1.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0565-25A432DB.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0565-A.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0565-N.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-12-02-095.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2022-HJ-03-24-031.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2022-SJ-03-24-031.htm

Bill Comments

feedback