MI SB0527 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-09 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-09 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; foster parents; weapon requirements for foster parents; modify. Amends 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.951 - 722.960) by adding sec. 8b.
Title
Human services; foster parents; weapon requirements for foster parents; modify. Amends 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.951 - 722.960) by adding sec. 8b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 446 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-11-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-09 | House | Received On 11/08/2017 |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 446 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |
Subjects
Children: foster care
Civil rights: equal protection
Human services: foster parents
Safety: other
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Weapons: safety and training
Civil rights: equal protection
Human services: foster parents
Safety: other
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Weapons: safety and training